Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/06/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/06/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 03/06/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/13/1997
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 03/13/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 03/18/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/18/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 03/20/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 04/08/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/08/1997
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 04/09/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/09/1997
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/15/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/15/1997
Rep. Johnson, Jay W. [D-WI-8] 04/23/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/24/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 04/30/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/07/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/07/1997
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/07/1997
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 05/13/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 05/14/1997
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/15/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/15/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/15/1997
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 05/21/1997
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/21/1997
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/22/1997
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/22/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/22/1997
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/03/1997
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 06/10/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/19/1997
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 06/26/1997
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/08/1997
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 07/09/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 07/09/1997
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 07/11/1997
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/24/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/24/1997
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 07/29/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/31/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/31/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 07/31/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/31/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 07/31/1997
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/31/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/04/1997
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/04/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/04/1997
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/04/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/04/1997
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 09/04/1997
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/04/1997
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 09/04/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 09/04/1997
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/04/1997
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/04/1997
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 09/04/1997
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 09/04/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/04/1997
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 09/04/1997
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/04/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/04/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 09/04/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/09/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/09/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/11/1997
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 09/11/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/11/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 09/11/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/18/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/23/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/23/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/23/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22] 09/23/1997
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/23/1997
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 09/23/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/24/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/24/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 09/25/1997
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/25/1997
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/26/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/29/1997
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 09/29/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/06/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 10/06/1997
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 10/06/1997
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 10/06/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/06/1997
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 10/06/1997
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/06/1997
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/08/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/09/1997
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 10/22/1997
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/22/1997
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 10/22/1997
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/22/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/22/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/24/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/29/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 10/31/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/31/1997
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/04/1997
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/07/1997
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 11/12/1997
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 11/13/1997
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/05/1998
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/19/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/23/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew