Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 05/08/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/08/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 05/08/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 05/20/1997
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 05/20/1997
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 05/20/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/20/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 05/20/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/20/1997
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/20/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/22/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 05/22/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 05/22/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 05/22/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/22/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 05/22/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/22/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 05/22/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/04/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/04/1997
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 06/04/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 06/04/1997
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 06/04/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/17/1997
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 06/17/1997
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/17/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 06/17/1997
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 06/23/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/23/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/23/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/23/1997
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/23/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 07/23/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 07/29/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 07/29/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/29/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/04/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 09/04/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/04/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 09/04/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 09/29/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 10/22/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 10/22/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 10/24/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 11/06/1997
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 11/06/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 11/09/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 11/09/1997
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 11/12/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 11/12/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/03/1998