Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 03/06/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/12/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/12/1997
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 03/12/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 03/12/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/12/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 03/13/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/10/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/10/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 04/10/1997
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/01/1997
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 05/14/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 05/14/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/14/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/24/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 07/09/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 07/09/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 09/24/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 11/05/1997
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 06/23/1998
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 06/25/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew