Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 07/08/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/09/1997
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/09/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 07/10/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/10/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/11/1997
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/11/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/11/1997
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 07/11/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/11/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/15/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/15/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 07/15/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/15/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 07/25/1997
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 09/08/1997
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/08/1997
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/08/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/06/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 10/06/1997
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 10/06/1997
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 10/06/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/06/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 10/07/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 10/07/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/08/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/08/1997
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 10/08/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 10/08/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 10/09/1997
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 10/09/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/21/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 10/21/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/21/1997
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 10/21/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 10/21/1997
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 10/21/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 10/21/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 10/22/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 10/23/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 10/29/1997
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/31/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 11/12/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 11/12/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 04/21/1998