Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 07/08/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 07/08/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 07/08/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 07/08/1997
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 07/08/1997
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 07/08/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 07/08/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 07/08/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 07/08/1997
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/09/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 07/09/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 07/09/1997
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/09/1997
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 07/09/1997
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 07/09/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/09/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/09/1997
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/09/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/09/1997
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 07/09/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 07/09/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 07/09/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 07/09/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/09/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 07/09/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/09/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/10/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 07/10/1997
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 07/10/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/10/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 07/10/1997
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 07/10/1997
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/10/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 07/10/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/11/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/11/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/11/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 07/11/1997
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/11/1997
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 07/11/1997
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/11/1997
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/15/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/15/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 07/15/1997
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 07/15/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/24/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/24/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 07/24/1997
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 07/24/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/24/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/24/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/31/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/31/1997
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 07/31/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 09/03/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 09/03/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/16/1997