Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 07/25/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 11/08/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/04/1998
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 03/04/1998
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/13/1998
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/22/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/22/1998
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/22/1998
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 05/22/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 06/09/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/10/1998