Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/31/1997
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 09/04/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 09/04/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 09/04/1997
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/04/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/04/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/18/1997
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 09/18/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/18/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 09/18/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/18/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 09/18/1997
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 10/24/1997
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 10/24/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/05/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/05/1997
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 11/05/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 11/05/1997
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 11/12/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 11/12/1997
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 11/12/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/12/1997
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 01/28/1998
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 01/28/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 01/28/1998
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 01/28/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 01/28/1998
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/04/1998
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/24/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 02/24/1998
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 02/24/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/24/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 02/24/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/24/1998
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 02/24/1998
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/24/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 03/12/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/12/1998
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/12/1998
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/01/1998
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 04/21/1998
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/21/1998
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 04/21/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/21/1998
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 04/30/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 04/30/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/19/1998
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/19/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/24/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/24/1998
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 06/24/1998
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/24/1998
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 07/21/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 07/21/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 07/21/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/21/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 08/06/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 08/06/1998
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 10/02/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 10/02/1998
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 10/02/1998
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 10/10/1998
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 10/10/1998