There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of the Congress that the Nation must place greater emphasis on helping young Americans to develop habits of good character that are essential to their own well-being and to that of our communities.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/28/1997Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
07/28/1997Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/28/1997Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1535-1536)
Action By: House of Representatives
07/28/1997Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (40)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 07/28/1997
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 07/28/1997
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 07/28/1997
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 07/28/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 07/28/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 07/28/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 09/03/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/03/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/03/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 09/23/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 09/23/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/23/1997
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/25/1997
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 10/01/1997
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 10/01/1997
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 10/01/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 10/01/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 10/09/1997
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 10/09/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/09/1997
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 10/09/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 10/29/1997
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 10/29/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 10/29/1997
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 01/28/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 01/28/1998
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 01/28/1998
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 01/28/1998
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/28/1998
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 01/28/1998
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 01/28/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 01/28/1998
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 02/24/1998
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 03/09/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/09/1998
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/25/1998
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 03/25/1998
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 04/28/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 05/05/1998
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/09/1998

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce07/28/1997 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.127. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/28/1997)

Expresses the sense of the Congress that it: (1) supports and encourages character building initiatives in schools across the Nation; and (2) urges colleges and universities to affirm that the development of character is one of the primary goals of higher education.