Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 07/28/1997
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 07/28/1997
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 07/28/1997
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 07/28/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 07/28/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 07/28/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 09/03/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/03/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/03/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 09/23/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 09/23/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/23/1997
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/25/1997
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 10/01/1997
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 10/01/1997
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 10/01/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 10/01/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 10/09/1997
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 10/09/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/09/1997
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 10/09/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 10/29/1997
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 10/29/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 10/29/1997
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 01/28/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 01/28/1998
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 01/28/1998
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 01/28/1998
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/28/1998
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 01/28/1998
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 01/28/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 01/28/1998
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 02/24/1998
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 03/09/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/09/1998
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/25/1998
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 03/25/1998
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 04/28/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 05/05/1998
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/09/1998