Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 07/29/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/05/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 09/05/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/17/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/17/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/17/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/01/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 10/01/1997
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 10/01/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 10/30/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 10/30/1997