Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 07/30/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12]* 07/30/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/30/1997
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 07/30/1997
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 07/30/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 07/30/1997
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 07/30/1997
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 07/30/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 07/30/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 07/30/1997
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 07/30/1997
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 07/30/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 07/30/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 07/30/1997
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 07/30/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22]* 07/30/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 07/30/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 07/30/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 07/30/1997
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 07/30/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 07/30/1997
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 07/30/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 07/30/1997
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 07/30/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 07/30/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 07/30/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 07/30/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 07/30/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 07/30/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 07/30/1997
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 07/30/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 07/30/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 07/30/1997
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 07/30/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/30/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 07/30/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 07/30/1997
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 07/30/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 07/30/1997
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 07/30/1997
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 07/30/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 07/30/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/31/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 07/31/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 09/03/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/03/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/03/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 09/03/1997
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/03/1997
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 09/03/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/03/1997
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/03/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/03/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/03/1997
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 09/03/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/03/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/03/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/03/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 09/03/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/03/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 09/03/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/03/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/03/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/03/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/03/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 09/03/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 09/03/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 09/03/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 09/03/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/03/1997
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 09/03/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/03/1997
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/03/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 09/03/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/03/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/03/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/03/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 09/03/1997
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 09/03/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/03/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 09/03/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/03/1997
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 09/03/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 09/03/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 09/03/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/03/1997
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 09/03/1997
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/03/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 09/03/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 09/03/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/03/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/03/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 09/04/1997
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 09/04/1997
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 09/04/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/04/1997
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 09/04/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/04/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 09/04/1997
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/04/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 09/08/1997
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/08/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 09/08/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/08/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/08/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 09/09/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 09/09/1997
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 09/09/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 09/09/1997
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 09/09/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/09/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/09/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 09/10/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 09/10/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/11/1997
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 09/16/1997