Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 09/17/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 09/17/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 09/23/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 10/29/1997
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 10/29/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 10/29/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 11/04/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 11/04/1997
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 11/06/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 11/07/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 11/07/1997
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 11/13/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/27/1998
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 01/27/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 01/27/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 01/27/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/04/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/04/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 02/04/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/11/1998
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/11/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/25/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/25/1998
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 03/10/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 03/12/1998
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/12/1998