Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 09/23/1997
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 09/23/1997
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 09/23/1997
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 09/23/1997
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 09/23/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 09/23/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 09/23/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 09/23/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 09/23/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 09/23/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 09/23/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 09/23/1997
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 09/23/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 09/23/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 09/23/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 09/23/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 09/23/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 09/23/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22]* 09/23/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 09/23/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 09/23/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 09/23/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 09/23/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 09/23/1997
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 09/23/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/09/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/09/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 10/09/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 10/09/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/21/1997
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 10/21/1997
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 10/28/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 10/28/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/28/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 10/28/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/29/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/29/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/29/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/30/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 11/09/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 11/09/1997