Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 11/07/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/07/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 11/07/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/07/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/07/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/07/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 11/07/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 11/07/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/07/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 11/07/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 11/07/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 11/07/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/07/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 11/07/1997
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 11/07/1997
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 11/07/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 11/07/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 11/07/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 11/07/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 11/07/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 11/07/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/09/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 11/09/1997
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 11/09/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 11/09/1997
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 11/09/1997
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/12/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 11/12/1997
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/12/1997
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 11/12/1997
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 11/12/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 11/12/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 11/12/1997
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 11/12/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 11/12/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 11/12/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/12/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/13/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 11/13/1997
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 11/13/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 11/13/1997
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 11/13/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/13/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/24/1998
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 02/24/1998
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 02/24/1998
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/24/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 02/24/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 02/24/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/24/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/21/1998
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 04/21/1998
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/21/1998
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 04/21/1998
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 04/21/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/21/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/21/1998
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/21/1998
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 04/21/1998
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 04/21/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/21/1998
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 04/21/1998
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 04/21/1998
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 04/21/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/21/1998
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 04/21/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/21/1998
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 04/21/1998
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 04/21/1998
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 04/21/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/21/1998
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/21/1998
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/21/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 04/21/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 04/21/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/21/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/21/1998
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 04/21/1998
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 04/21/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/21/1998
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 04/21/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/21/1998
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 04/21/1998
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 04/21/1998
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/21/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/21/1998
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/21/1998
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/23/1998
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/23/1998
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 04/23/1998
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/23/1998
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 04/23/1998
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 04/23/1998
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/23/1998
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 04/23/1998
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 04/23/1998
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 04/23/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 04/23/1998
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/23/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 04/23/1998
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 04/23/1998
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/23/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 04/23/1998
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 04/23/1998
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/23/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 04/23/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/23/1998
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/23/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 04/23/1998
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/23/1998
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 04/23/1998
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 04/23/1998
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 04/28/1998
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 04/28/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/28/1998
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 04/28/1998
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 04/28/1998
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 04/28/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/28/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 04/28/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 04/28/1998
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 04/28/1998
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 04/28/1998
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/28/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/28/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 05/05/1998
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/05/1998
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 05/05/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/05/1998
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 05/05/1998
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 05/05/1998
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/05/1998
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/07/1998
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 05/07/1998
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/07/1998
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/07/1998
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/07/1998
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 05/22/1998
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/22/1998
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 05/22/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/22/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 05/22/1998
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 06/25/1998