Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 11/07/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/13/1997
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 11/13/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/13/1997
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/13/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/13/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 11/13/1997
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 11/13/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 11/13/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 11/13/1997
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 11/13/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/13/1997
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/13/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 07/24/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/24/1998
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/24/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/24/1998
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/24/1998
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/24/1998
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/24/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/24/1998
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 08/05/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 08/05/1998
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 08/05/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 08/06/1998