Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 01/28/1998
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 01/28/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 01/28/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 01/28/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 01/28/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 01/28/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 01/28/1998
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/03/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 02/03/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/03/1998
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 02/03/1998
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 02/03/1998
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 02/03/1998
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 02/03/1998
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/12/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 02/12/1998
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 02/12/1998
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 02/12/1998
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/12/1998
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/12/1998
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 02/24/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/24/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 02/25/1998
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/25/1998
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 03/03/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/03/1998
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 03/03/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/03/1998
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 03/03/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/05/1998
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/10/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 03/11/1998
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/11/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/11/1998
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 03/11/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/12/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 03/12/1998
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/17/1998
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 03/17/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/18/1998
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/24/1998
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 03/24/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/25/1998
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 03/25/1998
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 03/26/1998
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/27/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/21/1998
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/21/1998
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/21/1998
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 04/21/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 04/27/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/05/1998
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/06/1998
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/14/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/19/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/19/1998
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 05/19/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 05/19/1998
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 05/19/1998
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/19/1998
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/19/1998
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/19/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/19/1998
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/20/1998
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/20/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 05/20/1998
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/20/1998
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/20/1998
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 05/20/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 05/20/1998
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/20/1998
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/20/1998
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/20/1998
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 05/20/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/20/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 05/20/1998
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/20/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/20/1998
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/21/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/21/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/21/1998
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/21/1998
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 05/21/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/21/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/21/1998
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 05/21/1998
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 05/21/1998
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/21/1998
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/21/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/21/1998
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/21/1998
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 05/21/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/21/1998
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/21/1998
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/21/1998
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 05/22/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/22/1998
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/22/1998
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 05/22/1998
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 05/22/1998
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 05/22/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 05/22/1998
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 05/22/1998
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 05/22/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/22/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/22/1998
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/22/1998
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 05/22/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 05/22/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/22/1998
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/22/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 05/22/1998
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/22/1998
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 05/22/1998
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/22/1998
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 05/22/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 05/22/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/22/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/22/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/22/1998
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/22/1998
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/22/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/22/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 06/03/1998
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 06/03/1998
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 06/03/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/03/1998
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/03/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 06/03/1998
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 06/03/1998
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/03/1998
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 06/05/1998
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 06/05/1998
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/16/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/16/1998
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/16/1998
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 06/16/1998
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/16/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/16/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 06/16/1998
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 06/16/1998
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/16/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/16/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/17/1998
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/17/1998
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 06/18/1998
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/18/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 06/18/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/18/1998
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/18/1998
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 06/18/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/18/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/18/1998
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/18/1998
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/22/1998
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/22/1998
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/25/1998
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 06/25/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 06/25/1998
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 06/25/1998
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 06/25/1998
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/25/1998
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/25/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/25/1998
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/25/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 07/14/1998
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 07/14/1998
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 07/14/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/14/1998
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/17/1998
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 07/21/1998
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/21/1998
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/24/1998
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 08/04/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 08/05/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 08/06/1998
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/14/1998