Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 02/25/1998
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 02/25/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 02/25/1998
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 02/25/1998
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 02/25/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/25/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 02/25/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/25/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 02/25/1998
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/25/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/25/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 02/25/1998
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/25/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/25/1998
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 02/25/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 02/25/1998
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 02/25/1998
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/12/1998
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/12/1998
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 03/12/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/12/1998
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 03/12/1998
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/12/1998
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/12/1998
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 03/12/1998
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 03/12/1998
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 03/12/1998
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 03/12/1998
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/12/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/12/1998
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/12/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 03/12/1998
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 03/12/1998
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 03/12/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/12/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 03/12/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 03/12/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/12/1998
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 03/12/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 04/29/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/29/1998
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/29/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 04/29/1998
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/29/1998
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 04/29/1998
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 04/29/1998
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/29/1998
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 04/29/1998
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 04/29/1998
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 04/29/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 04/29/1998
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 04/29/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/29/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 04/29/1998
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/29/1998
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 04/29/1998
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/29/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 04/29/1998
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 04/29/1998
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/29/1998
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/29/1998
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 04/29/1998
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 04/29/1998
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/29/1998
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/29/1998
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 04/29/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/29/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/29/1998
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 04/29/1998
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/29/1998
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 04/29/1998
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 04/29/1998
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/29/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 04/29/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 04/29/1998
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 04/29/1998
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 04/29/1998
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/29/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/29/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/19/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/19/1998
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/19/1998
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/19/1998
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/19/1998
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 05/19/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 05/19/1998
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 05/19/1998
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 05/19/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/19/1998
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 05/19/1998
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 05/19/1998
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/19/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/19/1998
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 05/19/1998
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 05/19/1998
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/19/1998
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/19/1998
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 05/19/1998
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/19/1998
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 05/19/1998
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 05/19/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/19/1998
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/19/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/03/1998
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/03/1998
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/03/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/03/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 06/03/1998
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 06/03/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/03/1998
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 06/03/1998
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/03/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 06/03/1998
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/03/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/03/1998
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/03/1998
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/03/1998
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/03/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 06/03/1998
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/03/1998
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/03/1998
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/03/1998
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 06/03/1998
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/03/1998
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 06/03/1998
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 06/03/1998
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 06/03/1998
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 06/03/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/03/1998
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 06/03/1998
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 06/03/1998
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/03/1998
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 06/03/1998
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/03/1998
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 06/03/1998
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 06/03/1998
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/17/1998
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 07/17/1998
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 07/17/1998
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 07/17/1998
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/17/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/17/1998
Rep. Johnson, Jay W. [D-WI-8] 07/17/1998
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 07/17/1998
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 07/17/1998
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/17/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/17/1998
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 07/17/1998
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 07/17/1998
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 07/17/1998
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/17/1998
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/17/1998
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 07/17/1998
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 07/17/1998
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 07/17/1998
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/17/1998
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/17/1998
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 07/17/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/17/1998
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/17/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/17/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/17/1998
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/17/1998
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/17/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 07/17/1998
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 07/17/1998
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/17/1998
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 07/17/1998
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/17/1998