Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 03/05/1998
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 03/05/1998
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 03/05/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/05/1998
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 03/05/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 03/05/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 03/10/1998
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/10/1998
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 03/10/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/10/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/10/1998
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/10/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/10/1998
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 03/10/1998
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 03/10/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/11/1998
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/11/1998
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/11/1998
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 03/11/1998
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 03/11/1998
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 03/12/1998
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 03/12/1998
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/12/1998
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 03/12/1998
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/12/1998
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 03/12/1998
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 03/17/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 03/17/1998
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/17/1998
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/17/1998
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/17/1998
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/17/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 03/17/1998
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 03/17/1998
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/23/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 03/23/1998
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 03/23/1998
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/23/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 03/23/1998
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/23/1998
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 03/26/1998
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 03/26/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/26/1998
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 03/26/1998
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 03/26/1998