Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/17/1998
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 03/25/1998
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 03/25/1998
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/27/1998
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 04/29/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 05/07/1998
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/07/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 05/07/1998
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/14/1998
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 05/14/1998
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 05/14/1998
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 05/21/1998
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/21/1998
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 05/21/1998