Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 02/26/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 02/26/1998
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 02/26/1998
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/12/1998
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 03/12/1998
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 03/12/1998
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 03/12/1998
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 03/24/1998
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 03/24/1998
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 03/24/1998
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 03/24/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/24/1998
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 03/24/1998
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/24/1998
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/24/1998
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/24/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/24/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 03/24/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/24/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/27/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 03/27/1998
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/27/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/27/1998
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 03/27/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/27/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 03/27/1998
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 03/27/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/01/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 04/01/1998
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 04/01/1998
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 04/01/1998
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/01/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/21/1998
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 04/21/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 04/21/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 04/21/1998
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 04/21/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/21/1998
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 04/21/1998
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 04/21/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 04/21/1998
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/21/1998
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 04/21/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/21/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/21/1998
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/21/1998
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 04/21/1998
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 04/21/1998
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/21/1998
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/21/1998
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/21/1998
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 04/22/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/22/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 04/22/1998
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 04/22/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/22/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/22/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/22/1998
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 04/22/1998
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 04/22/1998
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 04/22/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 04/23/1998
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/23/1998
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 04/23/1998
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/23/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/23/1998
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/23/1998
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/23/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 04/23/1998
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 04/23/1998
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/23/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/23/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/23/1998
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 04/23/1998
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 04/23/1998
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 04/23/1998
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/23/1998
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 04/23/1998
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 04/23/1998
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 04/23/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/23/1998
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 04/29/1998
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/29/1998
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/06/1998
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 05/06/1998
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 05/20/1998
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/20/1998
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 05/20/1998
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 05/20/1998
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/04/1998
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/04/1998
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 06/04/1998
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/04/1998
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/04/1998
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 06/04/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 06/04/1998
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/09/1998
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/09/1998
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/23/1998
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 06/25/1998
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/25/1998
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/20/1998
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 08/04/1998
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 08/04/1998
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 08/06/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 09/10/1998
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 09/10/1998
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/10/1998
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/10/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 09/10/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/10/1998
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 09/10/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/10/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 09/10/1998
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/10/1998
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 09/18/1998
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/18/1998
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/18/1998
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 09/18/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 09/25/1998
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 09/28/1998
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 09/28/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/02/1998
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/02/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 10/02/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 10/02/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/02/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/06/1998
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 10/06/1998
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 10/06/1998
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/06/1998
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 10/06/1998
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 10/06/1998
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 10/07/1998
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 10/07/1998
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 10/07/1998
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 10/07/1998
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/07/1998
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 10/09/1998
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 10/09/1998
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/09/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 10/15/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 10/20/1998