Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/24/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 03/24/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/24/1998
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 03/24/1998
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 03/24/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 03/24/1998
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 03/24/1998
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 03/24/1998
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/31/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 03/31/1998
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/31/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/01/1998
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 04/01/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/01/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 04/22/1998
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/22/1998
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/22/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/22/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/22/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/22/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/22/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 04/22/1998
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/22/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 04/22/1998
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/23/1998
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 04/23/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/05/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/05/1998
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/05/1998
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/05/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/06/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/12/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/12/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/21/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/21/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 06/03/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/03/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 06/03/1998
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/03/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 06/03/1998
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 06/03/1998
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/03/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/03/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/04/1998
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 06/04/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/04/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/04/1998
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/04/1998
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/04/1998
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 06/04/1998
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/09/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/09/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/09/1998
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/24/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/16/1998
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/23/1998
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 10/07/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 10/07/1998