Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 04/29/1998
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 04/29/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/29/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/29/1998
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/29/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/29/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/29/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/29/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/29/1998
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 04/29/1998
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/29/1998
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 04/29/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/29/1998
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 04/29/1998
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 04/29/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 04/29/1998
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/29/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/29/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/29/1998
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 05/06/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/06/1998
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/06/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/06/1998
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 05/06/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/06/1998
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/06/1998
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/06/1998
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/06/1998
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/06/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 05/06/1998
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/06/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/06/1998
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/06/1998
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/06/1998
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/06/1998
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/19/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/19/1998
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/19/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/19/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 05/19/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 05/19/1998
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/19/1998
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/05/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 06/05/1998
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 06/05/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/11/1998
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/18/1998
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/18/1998
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/14/1998
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/14/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/14/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/14/1998
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/14/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/14/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 07/14/1998
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 08/03/1998
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 08/03/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 08/03/1998
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 08/03/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 08/03/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 08/03/1998
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 08/03/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 08/03/1998
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 08/05/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/16/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/16/1998
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/16/1998
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/16/1998
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/16/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/16/1998
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/16/1998
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/16/1998
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/16/1998
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/25/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 09/25/1998
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/25/1998
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 09/25/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 09/25/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 10/07/1998
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/07/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/07/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 10/07/1998
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 10/07/1998
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 10/07/1998
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 10/07/1998
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/10/1998
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/13/1998
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 10/20/1998