Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 04/28/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 04/28/1998
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 04/28/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 04/28/1998
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 04/28/1998
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 04/28/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 04/30/1998
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 04/30/1998
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/30/1998
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/30/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 05/04/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/04/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/04/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/04/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 05/04/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/04/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 05/04/1998
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/05/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/05/1998
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 05/05/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/13/1998
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/13/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/13/1998
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/13/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 05/13/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/03/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/03/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/03/1998
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/03/1998
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/03/1998
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 06/04/1998
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/04/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 06/04/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/04/1998
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 06/25/1998
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/25/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 07/29/1998
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 08/04/1998
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/17/1998
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 10/02/1998