Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 05/07/1998
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 05/07/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 06/04/1998
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/04/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/04/1998
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/04/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/04/1998
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/04/1998
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 06/04/1998
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/22/1998
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 06/22/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/22/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/22/1998
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/24/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/24/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 06/24/1998
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/25/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/25/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/25/1998
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 06/25/1998
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/16/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 07/16/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/16/1998
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/16/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 07/16/1998
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 07/16/1998
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 08/04/1998
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 08/04/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 08/04/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 08/04/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 08/04/1998
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 08/04/1998
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 08/04/1998
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 08/04/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 08/04/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/11/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/11/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 09/11/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 09/11/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/11/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/11/1998
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 09/11/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/11/1998
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/11/1998
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/18/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/18/1998
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 09/18/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/18/1998
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/18/1998
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/18/1998
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/18/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 09/18/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/18/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/18/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 09/28/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 09/28/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/28/1998
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 09/28/1998
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/28/1998
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 09/28/1998
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 10/01/1998
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 10/02/1998
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 10/02/1998
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 10/02/1998
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 10/02/1998
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 10/02/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 10/02/1998
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 10/02/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 10/02/1998
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 10/02/1998
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 10/06/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 10/06/1998
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/06/1998
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 10/09/1998
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/09/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 10/16/1998
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 10/16/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/16/1998