Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/19/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 05/19/1998
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/19/1998
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 05/19/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 05/19/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 05/19/1998
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 05/19/1998
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/19/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 05/19/1998
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 05/19/1998
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 05/19/1998
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 05/19/1998
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 05/19/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/19/1998
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 05/19/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/19/1998
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 05/19/1998
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 05/19/1998
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 05/19/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 05/19/1998
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 05/19/1998
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 05/19/1998
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 05/19/1998
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 05/19/1998
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 05/19/1998
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 05/19/1998
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/19/1998
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 05/19/1998
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 05/19/1998
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/19/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/05/1998
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 06/05/1998
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 06/22/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 06/22/1998
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/22/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 06/22/1998
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 06/22/1998
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 06/22/1998
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 06/22/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 06/25/1998
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 06/25/1998
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/25/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/25/1998
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 06/25/1998
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/25/1998
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 06/25/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 07/20/1998
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 07/20/1998