Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 05/22/1998
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/22/1998
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/22/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/22/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/22/1998
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 05/22/1998
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 05/22/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 05/22/1998
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 05/22/1998
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 05/22/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/22/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/22/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 05/22/1998
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 05/22/1998
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 06/25/1998
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 06/25/1998
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 06/25/1998
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/25/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/25/1998
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 06/25/1998
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/25/1998
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/25/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/25/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 06/25/1998
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/25/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/25/1998
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/17/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 07/17/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/17/1998
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 07/17/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/17/1998
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 07/17/1998
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/17/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/17/1998
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/17/1998
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 07/17/1998
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/17/1998
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 08/06/1998
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 08/06/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 08/06/1998
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 08/06/1998
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 08/06/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 08/06/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 08/06/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 08/06/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 08/06/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 08/06/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 08/06/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 08/06/1998
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 08/06/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 08/06/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 08/06/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 08/06/1998
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 08/06/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 08/06/1998
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/23/1998
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 09/23/1998
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 09/23/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/23/1998
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 09/23/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 09/23/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 09/23/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 09/25/1998
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 10/05/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/05/1998
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 10/07/1998
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/15/1998