There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of Congress with respect to the fair and equitable implementation of the amendments made by the Food Quality Protection Act of 1996.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/11/1998Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
06/16/1998Referred to the Subcommittee on Department Operations, Nutrition and Foreign Agriculture.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
06/15/1998Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and Environment, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Chairman.
Action By: Committee on Commerce
06/11/1998Referred to House Commerce
Action By: House of Representatives
06/11/1998Referred to House Agriculture
Action By: House of Representatives
06/11/1998Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committee on Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/11/1998Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1105)
Action By: House of Representatives
06/11/1998Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (77)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 06/16/1998
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/16/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/17/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/17/1998
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/17/1998
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/17/1998
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 06/17/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/19/1998
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 06/19/1998
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 06/19/1998
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/24/1998
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/24/1998
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/24/1998
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 06/24/1998
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 06/24/1998
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 06/24/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/24/1998
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 07/14/1998
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/14/1998
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 07/14/1998
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/14/1998
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/14/1998
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/14/1998
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 07/14/1998
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/14/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/20/1998
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 07/20/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/31/1998
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 07/31/1998
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 07/31/1998
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 07/31/1998
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 08/03/1998
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 08/03/1998
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 08/03/1998
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 08/03/1998
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 08/03/1998
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 09/15/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/15/1998
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 09/15/1998
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/15/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 09/15/1998
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 09/15/1998
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 09/18/1998
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 09/18/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 09/18/1998
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 09/18/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/18/1998
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 09/18/1998
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-44] 09/18/1998
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/26/1998
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 09/26/1998
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 09/26/1998
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 09/26/1998
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 09/26/1998
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 10/02/1998
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 10/02/1998
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7] 10/02/1998
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 10/02/1998
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 10/02/1998
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 10/02/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 10/02/1998
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 10/02/1998
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 10/02/1998
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 10/02/1998
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 10/05/1998
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 10/05/1998
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 10/05/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 10/08/1998
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 10/08/1998
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 10/08/1998
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 10/08/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/08/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 10/08/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 10/08/1998
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 10/08/1998
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 10/08/1998
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 10/08/1998

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture06/11/1998 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Department Operations, Nutrition and Foreign Agriculture06/16/1998 Referred to
House Commerce06/11/1998 Referred to
House Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment06/15/1998 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.290.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.290. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/11/1998)

Expresses the sense of the Congress with respect to the implementation of the Food Quality Protection Act of 1996 and the related responsibilities of the Environmental Protection Agency.