Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 06/16/1998
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/16/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/17/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/17/1998
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/17/1998
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/17/1998
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 06/17/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/19/1998
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 06/19/1998
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 06/19/1998
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/24/1998
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/24/1998
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/24/1998
Rep. Thune, John R. [R-SD-At Large] 06/24/1998
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 06/24/1998
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 06/24/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/24/1998
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 07/14/1998
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/14/1998
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 07/14/1998
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/14/1998
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/14/1998
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/14/1998
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 07/14/1998
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/14/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/20/1998
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 07/20/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/31/1998
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 07/31/1998
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 07/31/1998
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 07/31/1998
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 08/03/1998
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 08/03/1998
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 08/03/1998
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 08/03/1998
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 08/03/1998
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 09/15/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/15/1998
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 09/15/1998
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/15/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 09/15/1998
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 09/15/1998
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 09/18/1998
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 09/18/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 09/18/1998
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 09/18/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/18/1998
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 09/18/1998
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 09/18/1998
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/26/1998
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 09/26/1998
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 09/26/1998
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 09/26/1998
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 09/26/1998
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 10/02/1998
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 10/02/1998
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7] 10/02/1998
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 10/02/1998
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 10/02/1998
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 10/02/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 10/02/1998
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 10/02/1998
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 10/02/1998
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 10/02/1998
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 10/05/1998
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 10/05/1998
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 10/05/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 10/08/1998
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 10/08/1998
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 10/08/1998
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 10/08/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/08/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 10/08/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 10/08/1998
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 10/08/1998
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 10/08/1998
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 10/08/1998