Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 07/17/1998
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 07/17/1998
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 07/17/1998
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/17/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/17/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/17/1998
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/17/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/17/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/17/1998
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/17/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/17/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 07/17/1998
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 07/17/1998
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/17/1998
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 07/17/1998
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 07/17/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/30/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/30/1998
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/30/1998
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 07/30/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/30/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/30/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 07/30/1998
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 08/06/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 08/06/1998
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 08/06/1998
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 08/06/1998
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 08/06/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 08/06/1998
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 08/06/1998
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 08/06/1998
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 08/06/1998
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 08/06/1998
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 08/06/1998
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 08/06/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 08/06/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 08/06/1998
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 09/09/1998
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/09/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 09/09/1998
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 09/09/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/09/1998
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 09/09/1998
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 09/09/1998
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/09/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/09/1998
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 09/09/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 09/09/1998
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 09/09/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/09/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/09/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/09/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 09/09/1998
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/10/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/10/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 09/10/1998
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/10/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/10/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/10/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/10/1998
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/16/1998
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/16/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 09/17/1998
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 09/17/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/23/1998
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/01/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 10/02/1998