Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 07/16/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3]* 07/16/1998
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 07/17/1998
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 07/17/1998
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/21/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/21/1998
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 07/21/1998
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 07/21/1998
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 07/21/1998
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 07/22/1998
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/22/1998
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 07/22/1998
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 07/22/1998
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/23/1998
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 07/23/1998
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/23/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 07/23/1998
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 07/24/1998
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 07/24/1998
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/24/1998
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 07/29/1998
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 07/29/1998
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 07/29/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/29/1998
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 08/04/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 08/05/1998
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 08/05/1998
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 08/05/1998
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 10/01/1998