There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Calling on the President to take all necessary measures to respond to the surge of steel imports resulting from the financial crises in Asia, Russia, and other regions, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/18/1998Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
09/18/1998Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/18/1998Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H8080)
Action By: House of Representatives
09/18/1998Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (124)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 09/18/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 09/18/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8]* 09/18/1998
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 09/18/1998
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 09/18/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 09/23/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 09/23/1998
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 09/23/1998
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/23/1998
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/23/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/23/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 09/23/1998
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/24/1998
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/24/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/24/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/28/1998
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 09/28/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 09/28/1998
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/01/1998
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 10/01/1998
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 10/01/1998
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 10/01/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/01/1998
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 10/05/1998
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 10/05/1998
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 10/06/1998
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 10/06/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 10/06/1998
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/06/1998
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 10/07/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 10/07/1998
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/07/1998
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 10/07/1998
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 10/08/1998
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 10/08/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 10/08/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/08/1998
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 10/08/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 10/08/1998
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/08/1998
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/08/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/09/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/09/1998
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 10/09/1998
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 10/09/1998
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 10/09/1998
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 10/09/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 10/09/1998
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 10/10/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 10/10/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 10/13/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 10/13/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/19/1998

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means09/18/1998 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.328.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.328. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/18/1998)

Calls upon the President to: (1) pursue enhanced enforcement of U.S. trade laws with respect to the surge of steel imports into the United States, including offsetting duties, quantitative restraints, and other authorized remedial measures; (2) pursue a more equitable sharing of the burden of accepting imports of finished steel products from Asia and the countries within the Commonwealth of Independent States; (3) establish a task force with responsibility for closely monitoring U.S. imports of steel; and (4) report to the Congress by January 5, 1999, with a comprehensive plan for responding to the import surge, including ways of limiting its deleterious effects on employment, prices, and investment in the U.S. steel industry.