Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 03/06/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/06/1997
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/17/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 07/17/1997
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/17/1997
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 07/17/1997
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/17/1997
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 07/17/1997
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 10/30/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 11/09/1997
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 03/04/1998
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 09/10/1998
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 10/16/1998
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 10/21/1998