Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 03/11/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 03/11/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 03/11/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 03/11/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/11/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 03/11/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/11/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 03/11/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/11/1997
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 03/11/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 03/11/1997
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 03/11/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 03/11/1997
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/11/1997
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 03/11/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 03/11/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 03/11/1997
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 03/11/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/11/1997
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15]* 03/11/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/11/1997
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/11/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 03/11/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 03/11/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/20/1997
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 03/20/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 03/20/1997
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 03/20/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/08/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/08/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/10/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/10/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/15/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/15/1997