Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/20/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/21/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/09/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 04/09/1997
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 04/09/1997
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 04/09/1997
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 04/09/1997
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 04/09/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/09/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/09/1997
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/09/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 04/09/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 04/17/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 04/17/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/17/1997
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 04/17/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/17/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/17/1997
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 04/17/1997
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 04/23/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/23/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/23/1997
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/23/1997
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 04/29/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 04/29/1997
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 04/29/1997
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/29/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 04/29/1997
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 04/29/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/29/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/29/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/01/1997
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 05/01/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 05/01/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 05/06/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/06/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 05/06/1997
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/06/1997
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/12/1997
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 05/12/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/12/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/12/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/12/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/12/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 05/15/1997
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/15/1997
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/15/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 05/15/1997
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/21/1997
Rep. Johnson, Jay W. [D-WI-8] 05/21/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/21/1997
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 05/21/1997
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/22/1997
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 05/22/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/22/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 06/03/1997
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/03/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/12/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/12/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/12/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/12/1997
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 06/12/1997
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 06/18/1997
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/18/1997
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/18/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/18/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/25/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/25/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/08/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/08/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/08/1997
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/16/1997
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 07/16/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/16/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 07/16/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/16/1997
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 07/16/1997
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 09/03/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/03/1997
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 09/03/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 09/03/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 09/04/1997
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 09/04/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/04/1997
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 09/04/1997
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/04/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 09/23/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/23/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/23/1997
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/23/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 11/04/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 01/27/1998
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 02/12/1998
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 02/12/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/12/1998
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 02/12/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 02/12/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 02/12/1998
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/26/1998
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 03/26/1998
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 04/23/1998
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/23/1998
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/23/1998
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/11/1998
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/11/1998
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 05/11/1998
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/16/1998
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/16/1998
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 06/16/1998
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 06/25/1998
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 06/25/1998
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 07/21/1998
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 07/21/1998
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/21/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 07/30/1998
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/30/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/30/1998
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 09/10/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/10/1998
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 09/10/1998
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 09/10/1998
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 09/10/1998
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 09/10/1998
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/10/1998
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/10/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/10/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/10/1998
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/10/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/10/1998
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/23/1998
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/23/1998
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/23/1998
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 09/23/1998
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 10/06/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 10/07/1998
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 10/07/1998
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 10/20/1998