Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 01/21/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/21/1997
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 01/21/1997
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 01/21/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 01/21/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 01/21/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 01/21/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 01/21/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 01/21/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 01/21/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 01/21/1997
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 01/21/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/04/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 02/04/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 02/04/1997
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 02/04/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 02/04/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 02/04/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/04/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/04/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/04/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/04/1997
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/04/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/04/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 02/13/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/13/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/13/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 02/27/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 03/05/1997
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/05/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 03/13/1997
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 03/13/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 03/13/1997
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/08/1997
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 04/16/1997
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/03/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/19/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 06/26/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 07/08/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 07/08/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/24/1997
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 07/28/1997
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 07/28/1997
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/08/1997
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 09/08/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 09/23/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/24/1997
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 10/24/1997