Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 04/10/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 04/10/1997
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15]* 04/10/1997
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 04/10/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 04/10/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 04/10/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Thune, John R. [R-SD-At Large]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 04/30/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/30/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/30/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/30/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/30/1997
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 04/30/1997
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 04/30/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/30/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/30/1997
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 04/30/1997
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/30/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/30/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 04/30/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 04/30/1997
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 04/30/1997
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 04/30/1997
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 04/30/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/30/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 04/30/1997
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 04/30/1997
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 04/30/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 04/30/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/30/1997
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 04/30/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/30/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 04/30/1997
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/30/1997
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 04/30/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 04/30/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 04/30/1997
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/30/1997
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 04/30/1997
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 04/30/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/30/1997
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/30/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/30/1997
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 04/30/1997
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 05/07/1997
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/07/1997
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 05/07/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/07/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/07/1997
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/07/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 05/07/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 05/07/1997
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/07/1997
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 06/05/1997
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/05/1997
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 06/05/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 06/05/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/05/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/05/1997
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/05/1997
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/05/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/05/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/05/1997
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/05/1997
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 06/05/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 06/05/1997
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 06/05/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/05/1997
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 06/05/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/05/1997
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/05/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/05/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 06/05/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/05/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 06/05/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/05/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/05/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/05/1997
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 06/05/1997
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/05/1997
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 06/05/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/05/1997
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/05/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/05/1997
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 06/05/1997
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 06/05/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/05/1997
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 06/05/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 06/05/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/05/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/05/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 06/05/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 06/05/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/05/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/05/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 06/05/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 06/05/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/05/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 06/05/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/05/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/05/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/10/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 06/10/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/10/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 06/10/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 06/10/1997
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/10/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 06/10/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/10/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/10/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 06/10/1997