Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 05/07/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6]* 05/07/1997
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/08/1997
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 05/08/1997
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/13/1997
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/13/1997
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 05/13/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 05/14/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 05/14/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/20/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/22/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/03/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 06/05/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/11/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 06/12/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/12/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 06/18/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/19/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 06/19/1997
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 06/25/1997