Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/20/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/03/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/11/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/19/1997