Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 05/07/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 05/13/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 05/14/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 05/14/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/20/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/11/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 06/18/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 06/19/1997