Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/25/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 02/25/1997
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 02/25/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/25/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 02/25/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/25/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 02/25/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 02/25/1997
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 02/25/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/25/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 02/25/1997
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 02/25/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 02/25/1997
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 02/25/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/25/1997
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 02/25/1997
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/25/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/25/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 02/25/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 02/25/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/17/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/17/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/17/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/17/1997
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/17/1997
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 03/17/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/17/1997
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/08/1997
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/08/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 04/08/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 04/08/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 04/14/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/14/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/14/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/14/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 04/14/1997
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/15/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 04/16/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22] 04/17/1997
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 04/17/1997