Refine your search

Refined by:

Alabama Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 07/09/1997
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/09/1997
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 07/09/1997
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 07/10/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/16/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/25/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 09/03/1997