Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/26/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/10/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/10/1997
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 07/16/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 09/03/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 09/03/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/03/1997
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 09/05/1997
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/09/1997
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/24/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/25/1997