Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 06/03/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/05/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/05/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/11/1997
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/24/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/15/1997
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 07/15/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/15/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/22/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 07/28/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/03/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/05/1997
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/25/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 10/07/1997