Refine your search

Refined by:

Michigan Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/03/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 06/03/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/05/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 07/15/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 07/15/1997
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/16/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 07/16/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/23/1997