Refine your search

Refined by:

Missouri Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 06/17/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/15/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/03/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 09/03/1997
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 09/09/1997
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 10/08/1997