Refine your search

Refined by:

North Carolina Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/03/1997
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/11/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 07/15/1997
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/24/1997
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 07/25/1997
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/03/1997
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/03/1997
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 09/03/1997