Refine your search

Refined by:

Ohio Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/03/1997
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/05/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 06/05/1997
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 07/09/1997
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/11/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/22/1997
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 07/25/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/31/1997
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 09/03/1997