Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/05/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/17/1997
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 06/24/1997
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 06/26/1997
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/15/1997
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/15/1997
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 07/29/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 07/31/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/03/1997
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 10/07/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 10/07/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/07/1997
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 10/07/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 10/08/1997
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 10/24/1997