Refine your search

Refined by:

Tennessee Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/03/1997
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/05/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 07/16/1997
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 07/31/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/21/1997