Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/19/1997
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/09/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/22/1997
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/03/1997
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 09/05/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/23/1997
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 10/07/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 10/21/1997
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 10/30/1997